Locke, Jr. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: James Allen Locke, Jr.
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00228
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of settlement WITH EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by James Allen Locke, Jr. (Herring, Chelsea)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of Dismissal without prejudice as to defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC only. Claims asserted against defendant, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., will proceed. Signed on 4/21/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by James Allen Locke, Jr. (Herring, Chelsea)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer is due on or before 5/20/2020. Signed on 4/15/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Danne Wayne Webb added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Webb, Danne)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by James Allen Locke, Jr.. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 4/2/2020, answer due 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Herring, Chelsea)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Dismissal without prejudice as to defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. only. Claims asserted against defendants, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc., will proceed. Signed on 4/10/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) Modified on 4/13/2020 to correct docket text (Anderson, Christy).
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by James Allen Locke, Jr. (Herring, Chelsea)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by James Allen Locke, Jr.. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Herring, Chelsea)
March 25, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Ellis, Lindsey)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Chelsea S Herring on behalf of James Allen Locke, Jr.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6792613. Service due by 6/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - M, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herring, Chelsea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locke, Jr. v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Allen Locke, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea S Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?