Phillips v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Richard Phillips
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2020cv00251
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 30 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 5/22/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/22/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2021 at 03:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed on 5/22/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
May 21, 2020 Filing 28 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(Stubbs, Kara)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. In light of the Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Show Cause Order explaining the delay in a proposed scheduling order, Doc. #26 , the parties must file their Proposed Scheduling Order on or before May 21, 2020. Signed on 05/19/2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Thompson, Amy)
May 18, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Richard Phillips. (Daesch, Martin)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Donald G. Norris for Richard Phillips allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
May 14, 2020 Filing 24 Motion to allow Donald G. Norris to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6859196) filed by Martin L Daesch on behalf of Richard Phillips. (Daesch, Martin)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The Parties' Proposed Scheduling Order was due on or before April 23, 2020. Doc. #10 . As of the date of this Order, no Proposed Scheduling Order has been filed. Therefore, on or before May 18, 2020, the Parties shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed. Signed on 05/11/2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Thompson, Amy)
May 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 21, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara) (Main Document 21 replaced on 5/15/2020) (Berner, Crystal).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Gregory David Rueb for Richard Phillips allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 13, 2020 Filing 19 Motion to allow Gregory D. Rueb to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6818843) filed by Martin L Daesch on behalf of Richard Phillips. (Daesch, Martin) (Main Document 19 replaced on 4/16/2020) (Berner, Crystal).
April 13, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of appearance by Martin L Daesch on behalf of Richard Phillips (Attorney Martin L Daesch added to party Richard Phillips(pty:pla))(Daesch, Martin)
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John A. Wharton for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to allow John A. Wharton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6816265) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Pamela J. Marple for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. In light of the fact that other counsel continue to represent Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Robert B. North, Jr.'s Motion to Withdraw, Doc. #11 , is granted. Signed on 4/3/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to allow Pamela J. Marple to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6807982) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of All Defendants. (Stubbs, Kara)
April 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 Motion to withdraw as attorney. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu) Modified on 4/3/2020 to reflect the correct motion (Houston, Kiambu).
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to withdraw as attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Stubbs, Kara) Modified on 4/3/2020 to correct docket entry (Houston, Kiambu).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/23/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 4/16/2020. Signed on 4/2/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 4/2/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. With the Consent of the Honorable Nanette K. Laughrey and pursuant to Local Rule 83.9, this case is hereby transferred. Case reassigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. District Judge Roseann Ketchmark no longer assigned to case. Signed on April 2, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Stubbs, Kara)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-03386.
March 27, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the Western District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
October 2, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-3386-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
October 2, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14712070 filed by Richard Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Represented By: Pamela J. Marple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Represented By: Pamela J. Marple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Phillips
Represented By: Baird Brown
Represented By: Martin L Daesch
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Represented By: Donald G. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?