Grimm v. P&S Transportation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Deborah J. Grimm
Defendant: P&S Transportation, LLC and Dale E. Thompson
Case Number: 4:2020cv00301
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deborah J. Grimm Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant Thompson filed by Timothy H. Bosler, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Grimm.(Bosler, Timothy)
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Rule 26 First Supplemental Disclosures filed by Timothy H. Bosler, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Grimm.(Bosler, Timothy)
June 3, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
June 2, 2020 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Thomas Bender(Judy, Michael)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Judy on behalf of Defendants P&S Transportation, LLC, Dale E. Thompson.(Judy, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Timothy H. Bosler, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Grimm.(Bosler, Timothy)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/14/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2021 10:00 AM via telephone conference. Jury Trial set for 6/14/2021 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 5/21/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by P&S Transportation, LLC, Dale E. Thompson. (Judy, Michael)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Deborah J. Grimm. (Bosler, Timothy)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of P&S Transportation, LLC.(Judy, Michael)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Dale E. Thompson.(Judy, Michael)
April 22, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 5/18/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/1/2020. Signed on 4/16/20 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 2016-CV08589, filed by Michael Judy on behalf of Dale E. Thompson, P&S Transportation, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6822461. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Judy, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimm v. P&S Transportation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&S Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J Stringer
Represented By: Michael Judy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale E. Thompson
Represented By: Benjamin J Stringer
Represented By: Michael Judy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah J. Grimm
Represented By: Timothy H. Bosler, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy H. Bosler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?