United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hudnall et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Brian Hudnall, BirdDog Oil Equipment, LLC, Phillip Hudnall, Todd Esh, Kansas Oil Reserves LLC, Duc "Doug&quot Nguyen, BirdDog Business Group LLC, Pharyn Resources LLC, Kansas Oil Reserves 2 LLC and DonDon LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00327
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/8/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 6/24/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 6/8/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver sent to Duc "Doug" Nguyen on 5/19/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Leiman, Timothy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver sent to Phillip Hudnall on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Leiman, Timothy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver sent to Pharyn Resources LLC on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Leiman, Timothy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver sent to Kansas Oil Reserves 2 LLC on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Leiman, Timothy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver sent to Kansas Oil Reserves LLC on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Leiman, Timothy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver sent to BirdDog Oil Equipment, LLC on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Leiman, Timothy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver sent to BirdDog Business Group LLC on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Leiman, Timothy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver sent to DonDon LLC on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Leiman, Timothy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver sent to Brian Hudnall on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Leiman, Timothy)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Jane L. Stafford on behalf of Todd Esh (Attorney Jane L. Stafford added to party Todd Esh (pty:dft))(Stafford, Jane)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 motion for consent judgment as to Todd Esh. See order for details. Signed on 5/20/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
May 19, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on as Document No. 6-2, Exhibit B - Proposed Judgment. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. The proposed order has been emailed to joella_baldwin@mow.uscourts.gov This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Kern, Kendra)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for consent judgment as to Defendant Todd Esh filed by Timothy Leiman on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent of Todd Esh, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Judgment)(Leiman, Timothy) Modified on 5/19/2020 please refer to docket modification.(Kern, Kendra)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Brian D Fagel on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Fagel, Brian)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Richard G Stoltz on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Stoltz, Richard)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Timothy Leiman on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Leiman, Timothy)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Timothy Leiman on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Filing fee waived. Service due by 7/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leiman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hudnall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hudnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BirdDog Oil Equipment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Hudnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Esh
Represented By: Jane L. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Oil Reserves LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duc "Doug&quot Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BirdDog Business Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharyn Resources LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Oil Reserves 2 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DonDon LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Brian D Fagel
Represented By: Richard G Stoltz
Represented By: Timothy Leiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?