Ellebracht v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Shelby Ellebracht
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00361
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Eric S. Playter on behalf of Plaintiff Shelby Ellebracht.(Playter, Eric)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is granted in part. Count V is dismissed for failure to state a claim; the motion is denied in all other respects. Signed on 7/1/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
June 29, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc..(Boggs, Beth)
June 24, 2020 Filing 21 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Mark Kempton(Waddell, Ashley)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 The Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan is GRANTED, up to and including July 22, 2020.Signed on 6/24/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
June 23, 2020 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for extension of time to file proposed scheduling order and discovery plan filed by Eric S. Playter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Playter, Eric)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Defendant's motion for extension of time to make its Rule 26 disclosures. Defendant's Rule 26 disclosures due on or before July 1, 2020. Signed on 6/17/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
June 16, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for extension of time to Make Rule 26 Disclosures and Suggestions in Support filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Walmart Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boggs, Beth)
June 10, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #5 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Boggs, Beth)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to make her Rule 16 disclosures is GRANTED up to and including July 1, 2020. Signed on 6/2/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for extension of time to make Rule 26 Disclosures and Suggestions in Support filed by Eric S. Playter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Playter, Eric)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shelby Ellebracht. (McInnes, Jack)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of Plaintiff Shelby Ellebracht. Reply suggestions due by 6/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (McInnes, Jack)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion for leave to file response out of time. Plaintiff shall have until and including May 26, 2020 to electronically file her response to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed on 5/22/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
May 22, 2020 Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/26/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 5/22/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to file response to Defendant's motion to dismiss out of time filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/4/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Suggestions in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(McInnes, Jack)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Inc. filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc..(Boggs, Beth)
May 13, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing (File-stamped Proof of Filing in State Court) by Walmart Inc. (Boggs, Beth)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/23/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 6/9/2020. Signed on 5/8/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Walmart Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boggs, Beth)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Boggs, Beth)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc..(Boggs, Beth)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing to Plaintiff by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal Documents)(Boggs, Beth)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 2016-CV09850, filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Walmart Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6848676. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Petition)(Boggs, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellebracht v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Beth C. Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Ellebracht
Represented By: Jack D McInnes
Represented By: Christopher R Playter
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Represented By: Eric S. Playter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?