Service Employees International Union HCII, Missouri/Kansas Division v. Midwest Division-RMC, LLC
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union HCII, Missouri/Kansas Division
Defendant: Midwest Division-RMC, LLC and Midwest Division-RMC, LLC doing business as Research Medical Center agent of STK Registered Agent, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00483
Filed: June 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 Clerk's ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (McIlvain, Kelly)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of dismissal Joint by Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. (Banocy, Matthew)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/25/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 8/11/2020. Signed on 7/8/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED, up to and including August 5, 2020. Signed on 7/7/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Matthew B Banocy on behalf of Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Banocy, Matthew)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Matthew B Banocy on behalf of Midwest Division-RMC, LLC (Attorney Matthew B Banocy added to party Midwest Division-RMC, LLC(pty:dft))(Banocy, Matthew)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Noland, Brian)
June 15, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
June 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brian Thomas Noland on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6898851. Service due by 9/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Collective Bargaining Agreement)(Noland, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Service Employees International Union HCII, Missouri/Kansas Division v. Midwest Division-RMC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Division-RMC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Division-RMC, LLC doing business as Research Medical Center agent of STK Registered Agent, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew B Banocy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union HCII, Missouri/Kansas Division
Represented By: Brian Thomas Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?