Metzger v. Baker Norton U.S., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Savannah L. Metzger
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., IVAX, L.L.C., Baker Norton U.S., Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., ALZA Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, L.L.C., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC, IVAX Corporation,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson Research & Development, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00543
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Referring Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of Defendants ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC.(Penticuff, Paul)
August 31, 2020 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT -Declaration of Paul S. Penticuff by ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC. (Penticuff, Paul)
August 31, 2020 Filing 29 SUGGESTIONS in support re #28 MOTION for order Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 8(a), 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of Defendants ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Penticuff, Paul)
August 31, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for order Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 8(a), 9(b) and 12(b)(6) filed by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Penticuff, Paul)
August 31, 2020 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by George Francis Verschelden on behalf of Defendants Baker Norton U.S., Inc., IVAX, L.L.C..(Verschelden, George)
August 31, 2020 Filing 26 SUGGESTIONS in support re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by George Francis Verschelden on behalf of Defendants Baker Norton U.S., Inc., IVAX, L.L.C.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Verschelden, George)
August 31, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by George Francis Verschelden on behalf of Baker Norton U.S., Inc., IVAX, L.L.C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Verschelden, George)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER entered by Judge Howard F. Sachs granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #23 ). Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and IVAX, LLC's answer is due by August 31, 2020. Signed on 8/5/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 4, 2020 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for extension of time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) filed by George Francis Verschelden on behalf of Baker Norton U.S., Inc., IVAX, L.L.C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney George Francis Verschelden added to party Baker Norton U.S., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney George Francis Verschelden added to party IVAX, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Verschelden, George) Modified on 8/4/2020: Docket text changed to reflect proper party affiliation at request of filing counsel. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER entered by Judge Howard F. Sachs. The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is granted, Doc. #21 . Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by August 31, 2020. Signed on 7/28/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
July 27, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) filed by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Penticuff, Paul)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney R. Bruce Hurley for ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, and Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Tracie J. Renfroe for ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, and Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Kristen R. Fournier for ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, and Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to allow R. Bruce Hurley to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6960409) filed by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC. (Penticuff, Paul)
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 Motion to allow Tracie J. Renfroe to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6960399) filed by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC. (Penticuff, Paul)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to allow Kristen R. Fournier to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6960381) filed by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC. (Penticuff, Paul)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of appearance by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC (Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party ALZA Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party Janssen Ortho LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party Janssen Research & Development LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC(pty:dft))(Penticuff, Paul)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Savannah L. Metzger. Janssen Research & Development LLC served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (DeGreeff, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Savannah L. Metzger. IVAX, L.L.C. served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (DeGreeff, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Savannah L. Metzger. Baker Norton U.S., Inc. served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (DeGreeff, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Savannah L. Metzger. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (DeGreeff, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Savannah L. Metzger. ALZA Corporation served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (DeGreeff, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Savannah L. Metzger. Janssen Ortho LLC served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (DeGreeff, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Savannah L. Metzger. Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (DeGreeff, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Savannah L. Metzger. Johnson & Johnson served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (DeGreeff, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Savannah L. Metzger. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 7/10/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (DeGreeff, David)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to District Judge Howard F. Sachs. Please note the new case number: 20-543-CV-W-HFS. (Melvin, Greg)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Vanessa H. Gross on behalf of Savannah L. Metzger (Attorney Vanessa H. Gross added to party Savannah L. Metzger(pty:pla))(Gross, Vanessa)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 10, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 7/31/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
July 10, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by David C. DeGreeff on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6938816. Service due by 10/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(DeGreeff, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metzger v. Baker Norton U.S., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVAX, L.L.C.
Represented By: George Francis Verschelden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Norton U.S., Inc.
Represented By: George Francis Verschelden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALZA Corporation
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: George Francis Verschelden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVAX Corporation,
Represented By: George Francis Verschelden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Research & Development, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savannah L. Metzger
Represented By: David C. DeGreeff
Represented By: Vanessa H. Gross
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?