Johnson v. Jennings
Petitioner: DeWayne Johnson
Respondent: Richard Jennings
Case Number: 4:2020cv00579
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: The petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied; the issuance of a certificate of appealability is denied; and this case is dismissed. (Willis, Kathy)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) the petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied; (2) the issuance of a certificate of appealability is denied; and (3) this case is dismissed. Signed on 9/1/2020 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Willis, Kathy)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 PETITIONER'S REPLY to Doc. #6 filed by DeWayne Johnson. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(Davies, Cindy)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Petitioner shall file a reply to Respondent's response (Doc. #6 ) on or before September 8, 2020, or this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed on 08/18/2020 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Richard Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Rodriguez, Evan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Evan Rodriguez on behalf of Richard Jennings (Attorney Evan Rodriguez added to party Richard Jennings(pty:res))(Rodriguez, Evan)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that: (1) Petitioner is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and (2) Respondent answer Petitioner's allegations and show cause on or before August 24, 2020, why the relief Petitioner seeks should not be granted. Signed on 07/22/2020 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by DeWayne Johnson. (Willis, Kathy)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DeWayne Johnson (Attachment: #1 Petition Exhibits)(Willis, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Jennings
Represented By: Evan Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DeWayne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?