Lewis v. Jackson County et al
Plaintiff: Rashaud Lewis
Defendant: Toney Manuel, Terrance Dooley, Jr., John Doe, Jane Doe, Raphael Okosi, Johnathan Baldree, Diana Turner, George Indelicato, Joseph Piccinini, Jen-I Pulos, Raymond W Holland, Ryan Arnold, Christopher Wolfe, Jackson County, Jacob Shaffer, Anyu Nji, Anthony A Brown, Ronnie Rahe, Henry Osuagwu, LT. Ronnie Rahe, CO. Terrance Dooley, Jr., CO. Ryan Arnold, CO. Shelton Smith, LT. Johnathan Baldree, LT. Toney Manuel, CO. Anyu Nji, CO. Raymond W Holland, LT. Ronnie Rahe, Jr., Jackson County, Missouri, Capt. Anthony A Brown and Capt. George Indelicato
Case Number: 4:2020cv00621
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2020 Filing 21 DESIGNATION of Mediator (Jay Daugherty) by Rashaud Lewis. (Allen, Daniel)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due on or before October 16, 2020. Signed on 9/22/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Dawn Joanna Diel on behalf of Defendants Raymond W Holland, George Indelicato, Jackson County, Missouri, Anyu Nji, Raphael Okosi, Henry Osuagwu, Joseph Piccinini, Ronnie Rahe, Jacob Shaffer, Christopher Wolfe.(Diel, Dawn)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Because Plaintiff has consented to the dismissal of Defendant Diana Turner her in official capacity (Doc. 16), the motion to dismiss is granted. Signed on 9/15/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM document #8 filed by Daniel L. Allen on behalf of Plaintiff Rashaud Lewis. Reply suggestions due by 9/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Allen, Daniel)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Daniel L. Allen on behalf of Plaintiff Rashaud Lewis. Reply suggestions due by 9/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Allen, Daniel)
September 10, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shelton Smith. (Woods, Gloria)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 motion for extension of time; granting #14 motion for extension of time. To ensure Plaintiff has enough time to fully respond to both motions, his suggestions in opposition/responses are due by 9/14/2020. However, no further extensions shall be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed on 9/9/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 Second MOTION for extension of time to the Motion to Dismiss filed as Document #8 filed by Daniel L. Allen on behalf of Rashaud Lewis. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Allen, Daniel)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 Second MOTION for extension of time to the Motion to Dismiss filed as Document #6 filed by Daniel L. Allen on behalf of Rashaud Lewis. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Allen, Daniel)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time; granting #11 motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's response is due by 9/8/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 9/3/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time to the Motion to Dismiss filed as Document #8 filed by Daniel L. Allen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Allen, Daniel)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time to the Motion to Dismiss filed as Document #6 filed by Daniel L. Allen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Allen, Daniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dawn Joanna Diel on behalf of Defendants Ryan Arnold, George Indelicato, Jackson County, Missouri, Anyu Nji, Raphael Okosi, Henry Osuagwu, Joseph Piccinini, Jacob Shaffer, Christopher Wolfe. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Diel, Dawn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dawn Joanna Diel on behalf of Ryan Arnold, George Indelicato, Jackson County, Missouri, Anyu Nji, Raphael Okosi, Henry Osuagwu, Joseph Piccinini, Jacob Shaffer, Christopher Wolfe. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Diel, Dawn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dawn Joanna Diel on behalf of Defendant Diana Turner. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Diel, Dawn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dawn Joanna Diel on behalf of Diana Turner. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Diel, Dawn)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 motion for extension of time. Defendants' responsive pleading is now due 8/19/2020 unless otherwise directed by the Court.. Signed on 8/13/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time filed by Dawn Joanna Diel on behalf of Ryan Arnold, Johnathan Baldree, George Indelicato, Jackson County, Missouri, Anyu Nji, Raphael Okosi, Henry Osuagwu, Joseph Piccinini, Ronnie Rahe, Jacob Shaffer, Diana Turner, Christopher Wolfe. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Diel, Dawn)
August 12, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 9/4/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/18/2020. Signed on 8/6/20 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Dawn Joanna Diel on behalf of Ryan Arnold, Henry Osuagwu, Jackson County, Christopher Wolfe, Raphael Okosi, Ronnie Rahe, Diana Turner, Johnathan Baldree, Raymond W Holland, Jacob Shaffer, Joseph Piccinini, Anyu Nji, George Indelicato. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6980421. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Civil Cover Sheet)(Diel, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Jackson County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toney Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Dooley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raphael Okosi
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Baldree
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Turner
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Indelicato
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Piccinini
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jen-I Pulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond W Holland
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Arnold
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wolfe
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Shaffer
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anyu Nji
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Rahe
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Osuagwu
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. Ronnie Rahe
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO. Terrance Dooley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO. Ryan Arnold
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO. Shelton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. Johnathan Baldree
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. Toney Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO. Anyu Nji
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO. Raymond W Holland
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. Ronnie Rahe, Jr.
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County, Missouri
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Anthony A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. George Indelicato
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashaud Lewis
Represented By: Daniel L. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?