Thomas v. Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc.
Plaintiff: LaSonja Thomas
Defendant: Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00653
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc.. (Young, Margaret)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant_s ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint on behalf of Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc..(Young, Margaret)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc. filed by Brad K. Thoenen on behalf of LaSonja Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thoenen, Brad)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 9/8/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc. (Attorney Daniel Patrick Johnson added to party Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc.(pty:dft))(Johnson, Daniel)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Margaret K Young on behalf of Defendant Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc..(Young, Margaret)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (Defendant's Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Complaint) on behalf of Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc..(Young, Margaret)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count IV (Retaliation - MHRA) of Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by Margaret K Young on behalf of Defendant Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc.. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Young, Margaret)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count IV (Retaliation - MHRA) of Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by Margaret K Young on behalf of Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Margaret K Young added to party Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc.(pty:dft))(Young, Margaret)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by LaSonja Thomas. (Thoenen, Brad)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by LaSonja Thomas. Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Thoenen, Brad)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc. filed by Brad K. Thoenen on behalf of LaSonja Thomas. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6994404. Service due by 11/12/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Thoenen, Brad)
August 14, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaSonja Thomas
Represented By: Brad K. Thoenen
Represented By: John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance America, Cash Advance Centers of Missouri, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Johnson
Represented By: Margaret K Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?