Gladney v. Phoenix Financial Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Sherron Gladney
Defendant: Phoenix Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00657
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the parties to file their joint stipulation of dismissal or status report re #10 Notice of Settlement filed by Sherron Gladney by 11/24/2020. Signed on 9/25/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of settlement by Sherron Gladney (Crump, James)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Brian D. Roth for Phoenix Financial Services, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to allow Brian D. Roth to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7055111) filed by Pamela Jane Winter on behalf of Phoenix Financial Services, LLC. (Winter, Pamela)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant Phoenix Financial Services, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint on behalf of Phoenix Financial Services, LLC.(Winter, Pamela)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/2/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 9/22/2020. Signed on 8/18/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Phoenix Financial Services, LLC filed by Pamela Jane Winter on behalf of Defendant Phoenix Financial Services, LLC.(Winter, Pamela)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Paul Croker on behalf of Phoenix Financial Services, LLC (Attorney Paul Croker added to party Phoenix Financial Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Croker, Paul)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Pamela Jane Winter on behalf of Phoenix Financial Services, LLC (Winter, Pamela)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 2016-CV08873, Phoenix Financial Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6996783. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - State Court File, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Winter, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gladney v. Phoenix Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Pamela Jane Winter
Represented By: Paul Croker
Represented By: Brian D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherron Gladney
Represented By: James Crump
Represented By: Ryan Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?