Clayton v. USA
Petitioner: Montez L Clayton
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2020cv00658
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOVANT'S REPLY to Doc. #8 filed by Montez L Clayton.(Davies, Cindy)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Movant file a reply to the Government's response (Doc. 8) by October 14, 2020. Signed on September 14, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McCoy, Mike)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Ashleigh Anna Ragner on behalf of Respondent USA. Reply suggestions due by 9/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ragner, Ashleigh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Ashleigh Anna Ragner on behalf of USA (Attorney Ashleigh Anna Ragner added to party USA(pty:res))(Ragner, Ashleigh)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that Respondent answer Movant's allegations and show cause on or before September 16, 2020, why the relief Movant seeks should not be granted. Signed on August 17, 2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Davies, Cindy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00958.
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Tue Jul 28 14:46:07 CDT 2020 (Marshall, Sean) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall TRANSFER the instant motion to vacate, set aside, or correct the sentence to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. (Case to be transferred after 8/11/2020.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/28/2020. (SMM) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Fri Jul 24 11:46:30 CDT 2020 (Bernsen, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB) (JAB). [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.]
July 24, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Jul 24 09:00:54 CDT 2020 (admin,) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.]
July 24, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by Petitioner Montez L. Clayton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form) (DLB). [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Ashleigh Anna Ragner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Montez L Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?