Robins v. U.S. Farathane, LLC
Plaintiff: Troy Robins
Defendant: U.S. Farathane, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00663
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Troy Robins. Waiver sent to U.S. Farathane, LLC on 8/18/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Thoenen, Brad)
August 18, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Farathane, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Farathane, LLC filed by Brad K. Thoenen on behalf of Troy Robins. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6997653. Service due by 11/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A)(Thoenen, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robins v. U.S. Farathane, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Robins
Represented By: Brad K. Thoenen
Represented By: John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Farathane, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?