Brown v. RealPage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert A. Brown
Defendant: RealPage, Inc. d/b/a Leasing Desk Screening
Case Number: 4:2020cv00664
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2021. Teleconference set for 10/21/2021, 2:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2021 10:00 AM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 10/15/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
October 12, 2020 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Phil Miller(Holzhueter, Kersten)
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by RealPage, Inc.. (Holzhueter, Kersten)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of RealPage, Inc..(Holzhueter, Kersten)
August 26, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/12/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 9/28/2020. Signed on 8/20/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendants Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED, up to and including September 24, 2020. Signed on 8/18/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer [1-1] filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of RealPage, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Holzhueter, Kersten)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice in State Court by RealPage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Holzhueter, Kersten)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of Defendant RealPage, Inc..(Holzhueter, Kersten)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 2016-CV14941, filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of RealPage, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6998943. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holzhueter, Kersten)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. RealPage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RealPage, Inc. d/b/a Leasing Desk Screening
Represented By: Joshua C Dickinson
Represented By: Kersten Holzhueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Brown
Represented By: Charles Jason Brown
Represented By: Jayson A. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?