Ray v. Bureau of Prisons
Petitioner: Steven C. Ray, Jr.
Respondent: Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 4:2020cv00667
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed without prejudice. (Willis, Kathy)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that this habeas corpus case, in which Petitioner seeks compassionate release, is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall file Petitioner's request for release (Doc. 1) in his criminal case. Signed on August 19, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McCoy, Mike) (CLERK'S NOTE: Request for release filed on this date in Case No. 13-415-02-CR-W-DGK as directed. (Willis, Kathy).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00166.
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to immediately transfer a copy of this order and the original file of this Court to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/17/2020. (jbh) [Transferred from ared on 8/18/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Compassionate Release filed by Steven C Ray, Jr. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 8/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven C. Ray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?