Bowers v. Arthur Fels Company, et al
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Clifford Trenton, Arthur Fels Company d/b/a Casa Loma Apartments, Steven Trenton and Arthur Fels Company doing business as Casa Loma Apartments
Case Number: 4:2020cv00709
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order of Dismissal. Signed on 10/29/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants answer due 10/30/20.. Signed on 9/30/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Garrett Wade Hunkins on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Garrett Wade Hunkins added to party Arthur Fels Company(pty:dft), Attorney Garrett Wade Hunkins added to party Clifford Trenton(pty:dft), Attorney Garrett Wade Hunkins added to party Steven Trenton(pty:dft))(Hunkins, Garrett)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Steven Trenton served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Voytas, Richard)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Arthur Fels Company served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Voytas, Richard)
September 4, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 ***Remark AO-121, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights. (Kern, Kendra)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing AO 121 by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-7028760. Service due by 12/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Arthur Fels Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Trenton
Represented By: Garrett Wade Hunkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Fels Company d/b/a Casa Loma Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Trenton
Represented By: Garrett Wade Hunkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Fels Company doing business as Casa Loma Apartments
Represented By: Garrett Wade Hunkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?