Swisher v. Munstermann
Plaintiff: Edward Abraham Swisher
Defendant: Scott Munsterman
Case Number: 4:2020cv00713
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's order. (Willis, Kathy)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's order. Any motion to reopen this case must be filed within a reasonable period of time and must comply with the Court's previous Order. Signed on 10/20/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Willis, Kathy)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis;(2) the agency having custody of Plaintiff will be required to forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's inmate account each time the amount in that account exceeds $10 until the balance of the $350 filing fee is paid; (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff another set of civil rights forms for his use in filing an amended complaint; (4) Plaintiff is directed to file a single amended complaint, as specifically discussed above; and (5) Plaintiff's failure to amend the complaint as directed, on or before October 13, 2020, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on 9/28/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (CLERK'S NOTE: Collect filing fee letter and a copy of 9/28/2020 Order mailed to Johnson County Jail as directed. A set of civil rights forms and a copy of 9/28/2020 Order mailed to Plaintiff as directed. (Willis, Kathy)
September 24, 2020 RECEIPT number KCMO086425 in the amount of $87.16 issued to Edward A Swisher. (Kern, Kendra)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $87.16; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before September 30, 2020, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on September 16, 2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Davies, Cindy)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Edward Abraham Swisher. (Davies, Cindy)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Edward Abraham Swisher. (Davies, Cindy)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sheriff Munstermann filed by Edward Abraham Swisher. (Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swisher v. Munstermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Abraham Swisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Munsterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?