Grady v. Hy-Vee, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Karla Grady
Defendant: Tony J. Demaria and Hy-Vee, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00740
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE to take deposition of Karla Grady filed by Jeffrey A. Kennard on behalf of Defendants Tony J. Demaria, Hy-Vee, Inc..(Kennard, Jeffrey)
November 11, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karla Grady of Opening Discovery to All Defendants filed by Peter E. Goss on behalf of Plaintiff Karla Grady.(Goss, Peter)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 RULES OF JURY TRIAL. Signed on 11/4/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/29/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2021 at 10:30 AM Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Jury Trial set for 9/7/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 11/4/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
November 4, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/4/2020. Scheduling Order to be entered. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Peter Goss. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Jeffrey Kennard. Time in court: 1:20 p.m. to 1:30 p.m. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tony J. Demaria, Hy-Vee, Inc. filed by Jeffrey A. Kennard on behalf of Defendants Tony J. Demaria, Hy-Vee, Inc..(Kennard, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Nancy E. Kenner(Kennard, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jeffrey A. Kennard on behalf of Defendants Tony J. Demaria, Hy-Vee, Inc..(Kennard, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Hy-Vee filed by Jeffrey A. Kennard on behalf of Defendants Tony J. Demaria, Hy-Vee, Inc..(Kennard, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Jeffrey A. Kennard on behalf of Tony J. Demaria, Hy-Vee, Inc. (Kennard, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery and Scheduling Plan by Tony J. Demaria, Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Kennard, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Tony J. Demaria.(Kennard, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc..(Kennard, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/22/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 9/18/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 2016-CV15788, filed by Jeffrey A. Kennard on behalf of Tony J. Demaria, Hy-Vee, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7048548. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennard, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady v. Hy-Vee, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Grady
Represented By: Anne Marie Marchael
Represented By: Peter E. Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony J. Demaria
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Kennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Kennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?