Crowley v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Drew Alan Crowley
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00779
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 12/21/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/4/2021. Signed on 11/18/20 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Strodtman, Tracy)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Joseph C. Devine for Norfolk Southern Railway Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Church, Daniel)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to allow Joseph to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7142422) filed by Daniel F Church on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Church, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 motion for extension of time. Response due on or before 11/12/2020. Signed on 11/3/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Complaint filed by Daniel F Church on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/12/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Daniel F Church added to party Norfolk Southern Railway Company(pty:dft))(Church, Daniel)
September 29, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Woods, Gloria)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company filed by Nelson G Wolff on behalf of Drew Alan Crowley. Filing fee $400, receipt number CMOWDC-7067183. Service due by 12/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolff, Nelson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowley v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Joseph C. Devine
Represented By: Daniel F Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Alan Crowley
Represented By: Nelson G Wolff
Represented By: Celia K. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?