Payne v. The Service Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jamisha Payne and Jamel Payne
Defendant: The Service Companies, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Acrobat Outsourcing and Embassy Suites Management, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00786
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2020 Filing 23 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alexander Edelman on behalf of Plaintiff Jamisha Payne. Reply suggestions due by 12/11/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Attorney Alexander Edelman added to party Jamisha Payne(pty:pla))(Edelman, Alexander)
November 25, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Embassy Suites Management, LLC of First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by Alyssa Gonnerman on behalf of Defendant Embassy Suites Management, LLC.(Gonnerman, Alyssa)
November 25, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
November 24, 2020 Filing 21 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Joe Eischens(Gonnerman, Alyssa)
November 23, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Blake Michael Edwards on behalf of Defendant The Service Companies, Inc..(Edwards, Blake)
November 23, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Sarah C. Liesen on behalf of Plaintiff Jamisha Payne.(Liesen, Sarah)
November 23, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Alyssa Gonnerman on behalf of Defendants Embassy Suites Management, LLC, Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc..(Gonnerman, Alyssa)
November 19, 2020 Filing 17 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Embassy Suites Management, LLC. (Gonnerman, Alyssa)
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of The Service Companies, Inc..(Rupe, Alan)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 11/9/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by Sarah C. Liesen on behalf of Jamisha Payne. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Liesen, Sarah)
October 29, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Alyssa Gonnerman on behalf of Defendant Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc..(Gonnerman, Alyssa)
October 29, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Alyssa Gonnerman on behalf of Defendant Embassy Suites Management, LLC.(Gonnerman, Alyssa)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Blake Michael Edwards on behalf of Defendant The Service Companies, Inc..(Edwards, Blake)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Blake Michael Edwards on behalf of The Service Companies, Inc. (Attorney Blake Michael Edwards added to party The Service Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Edwards, Blake)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Alan L. Rupe on behalf of The Service Companies, Inc. (Attorney Alan L. Rupe added to party The Service Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rupe, Alan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alyssa Gonnerman on behalf of Defendants Embassy Suites Management, LLC, Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Gonnerman, Alyssa)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alyssa Gonnerman on behalf of Embassy Suites Management, LLC, Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Gonnerman, Alyssa)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Embassy Suites Management, LLC answer due 10/23/2020; Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc. answer due 10/23/2020.. Signed on 10/8/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Embassy Suites Management, LLC, Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/19/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 11/9/2020. Signed on 10/5/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Defendant The Service Companies, Inc.'s Consent to Removal by Embassy Suites Management, LLC, Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 2016-CV17843, filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number CMOWDC-7076490. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(DeVeney, Jeannie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. The Service Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamisha Payne
Represented By: Sarah C. Liesen
Represented By: Alexander Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamel Payne
Represented By: Sarah C. Liesen
Represented By: Alexander Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Service Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Blake Michael Edwards
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa Gonnerman
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acrobat Outsourcing
Represented By: Blake Michael Edwards
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embassy Suites Management, LLC
Represented By: Alyssa Gonnerman
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?