Staley v. Arch Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Chance Staley
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company and Out of Towne, LLC doing business as Red Sky Travel Insurance
Case Number: 4:2020cv00833
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:20-cv-02223.
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 20-cv-02223 DDD, to the Western District of Missouri, to become part of MDL 2955 by Clerk on 10/14/2020. (evana, ) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/9/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, ) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02223-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, ) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER vacating the October 21, 2020 Status Conference by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/6/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Arch Insurance Company, Out of Towne, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Lechner, Coleman) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Coleman Thomas Lechner on behalf of Out of Towne, LLCAttorney Coleman Thomas Lechner added to party Out of Towne, LLC(pty:dft) (Lechner, Coleman) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER re: 10 Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/2/2020. Due to an unavoidable conflict with the court's calendar, the Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/20/2020 is VACATED and RESET for 10/21/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All other deadlines remain set. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/26/2020. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before 11/6/2020. All other deadlines REMAIN SET. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, ) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and to Continue Court Scheduled Deadlines by Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Lechner, Coleman) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Coleman Thomas Lechner on behalf of Arch Insurance CompanyAttorney Coleman Thomas Lechner added to party Arch Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lechner, Coleman) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/20/2020. Upon review of the #7 Amended Complaint and the #9 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Chance Staley, the court is satisfied that complete diversity exists among the Parties and therefore DISCHARGES the #6 Order to Show Cause. Furthermore, the Parties shall complete and file the Consent Form by 10/6/2020, and a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/20/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. Finally, Plaintiff shall promptly notify the court should this civil action be transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 by Plaintiff Chance Staley. (Lindstrom, Christopher) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Chance Staley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lindstrom, Christopher) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Company, Out of Towne, LLC, filed by Chance Staley.(Lindstrom, Christopher) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/31/20 returnable by Plaintiff, as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 8/14/2020. (nmarb, ) Modified on 8/21/2020 to as DISCHARGED pursuant to 10 Minute Order. (nmarb, ). [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Arch Insurance Company & Out of Towne by Plaintiff Chance Staley. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Lindstrom, Christopher) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summons submitted is incomplete and not issued. Attorneys are not allowed to issue summonses pursuant to Fed. Civ. Rule 4. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jtorr, ) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Company, Out of Towne, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7407976)Attorney Christopher David Lindstrom added to party Chance Staley(pty:dft), filed by Chance Staley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lindstrom, Christopher) [Transferred from cod on 10/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staley v. Arch Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Coleman Thomas Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Out of Towne, LLC doing business as Red Sky Travel Insurance
Represented By: Coleman Thomas Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chance Staley
Represented By: Christopher David Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?