National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United v. Midwest Division-RMC, LLC
Plaintiff: National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United
Defendant: Midwest Division-RMC, LLC, d/b/a Research Medical Center and Midwest Division-RMC, LLC doing business as Research Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2020cv00903
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 14 Before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of time to File Suggestions in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. #13.) For good cause stated, the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff is hereby granted an extension of time up to and including February 2, 2021, to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
December 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #12 Suggestions in Support of Motion, #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Unopposed filed by Jason R. McClitis on behalf of National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/11/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #12 , #11 ) (McClitis, Jason)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Corey Louis Franklin on behalf of Defendant Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Franklin, Corey)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Corey Louis Franklin on behalf of Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Franklin, Corey)
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 Before the Court is Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Suggestions in Support. (Doc. #9). For good cause stated and based on a showing of excusable neglect, the motion is granted. Defendant Midwest Division-RMC is hereby granted an extension of time until and including December 23, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed on 12/15/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time to file answer and suggestions in support filed by Matthew B Banocy on behalf of Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Banocy, Matthew)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Matthew B Banocy on behalf of Midwest Division-RMC, LLC (Attorney Matthew B Banocy added to party Midwest Division-RMC, LLC(pty:dft))(Banocy, Matthew)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Corey Louis Franklin on behalf of Midwest Division-RMC, LLC (Attorney Corey Louis Franklin added to party Midwest Division-RMC, LLC(pty:dft))(Franklin, Corey)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United. Midwest Division-RMC, LLC served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (McClitis, Jason)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Micah L Berul for National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
November 12, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Midwest Division-RMC, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
November 11, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST filed by Jason R. McClitis on behalf of Plaintiff National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United.(McClitis, Jason)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to allow Micah L. Berul to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7140360) filed by Jason R. McClitis on behalf of National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United. (McClitis, Jason)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midwest Division-RMC, LLC, d/b/a Research Medical Center filed by Jason R. McClitis on behalf of National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-7140355. Service due by 2/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(McClitis, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United v. Midwest Division-RMC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Micah L Berul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Division-RMC, LLC, d/b/a Research Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Division-RMC, LLC doing business as Research Medical Center
Represented By: Corey Louis Franklin
Represented By: Matthew B Banocy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?