House et al v. QuikTrip Corporation
Plaintiff: John House and Paula House
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00923
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by QuikTrip Corporation filed by Brian Nye on behalf of Defendant QuikTrip Corporation.(Nye, Brian)
January 14, 2021 Filing 24 Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Paula House filed by Brian Nye on behalf of Defendant QuikTrip Corporation.(Nye, Brian)
January 13, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs of Responses to Defendant's First Set of Discovery Requests filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiffs John House, Paula House.(Turner, John)
January 12, 2021 Filing 22 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by John House, Paula House. (Turner, John)
January 12, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the documents filed on 1/11/2021 as Document No. 18 and 19, Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Amended PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. The documents have been deleted per Administrative Procedures wherein it is stated proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
January 11, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE to take deposition of Paula House filed by Brian Nye on behalf of Defendant QuikTrip Corporation.(Nye, Brian)
January 11, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE to take deposition of Amanda Lile filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiffs John House, Paula House.(Turner, John)
January 11, 2021 Filing 19 Amended PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by John House, Paula House. (Turner, John)
January 11, 2021 Filing 18 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by John House, Paula House. (Turner, John)
January 7, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs of Opening Interrogatories to Defendant filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiffs John House, Paula House.(Turner, John)
January 6, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Second Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiffs John House, Paula House.(Turner, John)
January 5, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by QuikTrip Corporation filed by Brian Nye on behalf of Defendant QuikTrip Corporation.(Nye, Brian)
December 31, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Brian Nye on behalf of Defendant QuikTrip Corporation.(Nye, Brian)
December 30, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiffs John House, Paula House.(Turner, John)
December 23, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by John E. Turner on behalf of Plaintiffs John House, Paula House.(Turner, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Bill Sanders, Jr., Esq.(Nye, Brian)
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Greg Kays. Please note the new case number: 20-923-CV-W-DGK. (Melvin, Greg)
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by QuikTrip Corporation filed by Brian Nye on behalf of Defendant QuikTrip Corporation.(Nye, Brian)
December 11, 2020 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties : All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
November 25, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John House, Paula House. (Turner, John)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 1/11/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 12/28/2020. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Notice of Pretrial Procedures. Signed on November 19, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Proof of Filing in State Court by QuikTrip Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nye, Brian)
November 18, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/9/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Karrie J. Clinkinbeard on behalf of QuikTrip Corporation (Attorney Karrie J. Clinkinbeard added to party QuikTrip Corporation(pty:dft))(Clinkinbeard, Karrie)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of QuikTrip Corporation.(Nye, Brian)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brian Nye on behalf of Defendant QuikTrip Corporation.(Nye, Brian)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 2016-cv22192, filed by Brian Nye on behalf of QuikTrip Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7150296. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nye, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: House et al v. QuikTrip Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Represented By: Brian Nye
Represented By: Karrie J. Clinkinbeard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John House
Represented By: Marty W. Seaton
Represented By: John E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula House
Represented By: Marty W. Seaton
Represented By: John E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?