Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund et al v. Blue Nile Contractors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Reginald L. Thomas, Jason Mendenhall, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, Kevin R Fahey, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund, Gabriel T Jones, Byron Hornung, Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund, Mathew J Bowen, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund and Donald E Greenwell, III
Defendant: Blue Nile Contractors, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00053
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: W Brian Gaddy
Referring Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Bradley Jay Sollars on behalf of Plaintiffs Mathew J Bowen, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Kevin R Fahey, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, Donald E Greenwell, III, Byron Hornung, Gabriel T Jones, Jason Mendenhall, Reginald L. Thomas.(Sollars, Bradley)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 4/10/2021. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/24/2021. Signed on March 11, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
March 9, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Blue Nile Contractors, Inc..(Murphy, Mark)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 unopposed motion for leave to file response out of time. Signed on 3/9/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 unopposed motion to set aside default. Signed on 3/9/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
March 9, 2021 Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in support re #15 MOTION for leave to file Unopposed filed by Mark D. Murphy on behalf of Defendant Blue Nile Contractors, Inc.. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Murphy, Mark)
March 9, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to file Unopposed filed by Mark D. Murphy on behalf of Blue Nile Contractors, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/23/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Form of Response to Complaint)(Murphy, Mark)
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in support re #13 MOTION to set aside default Unopposed filed by Mark D. Murphy on behalf of Defendant Blue Nile Contractors, Inc.. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Murphy, Mark)
March 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to set aside default Unopposed filed by Mark D. Murphy on behalf of Blue Nile Contractors, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/23/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Mark D. Murphy added to party Blue Nile Contractors, Inc.(pty:dft))(Murphy, Mark)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Blue Nile Contractors, Inc. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as premature #4 Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment. Signed on 3/8/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Please note the new case number: 21-0053-CV-W-RK. (Melvin, Greg)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: On February 23, 2021, Plaintiffs filed motions for default judgment (Docs. 4, 6). To date, the parties have not consented to jurisdiction before the undersigned. In light of the pending motions and lack of consent, the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to randomly reassign this matter to a district court judge. Signed on 2/24/21 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Auditor by Mathew J Bowen, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Kevin R Fahey, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, Donald E Greenwell, III, Byron Hornung, Gabriel T Jones, Jason Mendenhall, Reginald L. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sollars, Bradley)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Attorneys' Fees by Mathew J Bowen, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Kevin R Fahey, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, Donald E Greenwell, III, Byron Hornung, Gabriel T Jones, Jason Mendenhall, Reginald L. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sollars, Bradley)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for default judgment by Clerk of Court filed by Bradley Jay Sollars on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sollars, Bradley)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUGGESTIONS in support re #4 MOTION for default judgment filed by Bradley Jay Sollars on behalf of Plaintiffs Mathew J Bowen, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Kevin R Fahey, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, Donald E Greenwell, III, Byron Hornung, Gabriel T Jones, Jason Mendenhall, Reginald L. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Sollars, Bradley)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for default judgment filed by Bradley Jay Sollars on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sollars, Bradley)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Defendant Blue Nile Contractors, Inc. served on 1/29/2021. Answer due 2/19/2021. (Sollars, Bradley) Modified on 2/8/2021: Service and answer due date added to docket text. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bradley Jay Sollars on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7255755. Service due by 4/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sollars, Bradley)
January 27, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Henok Tekeste, Registered Agent for Blue Nile Contractors, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
January 27, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 2/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund et al v. Blue Nile Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald L. Thomas
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Mendenhall
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin R Fahey
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel T Jones
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Hornung
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew J Bowen
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E Greenwell, III
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Nile Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?