United States of America v. HS Produkt (Springfield Armory USA), XDE model, .45 ACP caliber, semi-automatic pistol, bearing serial number HE119615 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: HS Produkt (Springfield Armory USA), XDE model, .45 ACP caliber, semi-automatic pistol, bearing serial number HE119615 and Six rounds of .45 auto caliber, Winchester brand, ammunition
Case Number: 4:2021cv00089
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to HS Produkt (Springfield Armory USA), XDE model,.45 ACP caliber, semi-automatic pistol, bearing serial number HE119615, Six rounds of.45 auto caliber, Winchester brand, ammunition. HS Produkt (Springfield Armory USA), XDE model,.45 ACP caliber, semi-automatic pistol, bearing serial number HE119615, Six rounds of.45 auto caliber, Winchester brand, ammunition served on 2/25/2021. (Nguyen, Nhan)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Elizabeth Glynn by United States of America (Nguyen, Nhan)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Ronnie Brown by United States of America (Nguyen, Nhan)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against HS Produkt (Springfield Armory USA), XDE model,.45 ACP caliber, semi-automatic pistol, bearing serial number HE119615, Six rounds of.45 auto caliber, Winchester brand, ammunition filed by Nhan D Nguyen on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 5/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nguyen, Nhan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. HS Produkt (Springfield Armory USA), XDE model, .45 ACP caliber, semi-automatic pistol, bearing serial number HE119615 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HS Produkt (Springfield Armory USA), XDE model, .45 ACP caliber, semi-automatic pistol, bearing serial number HE119615
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six rounds of .45 auto caliber, Winchester brand, ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nhan D Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?