Fisher v. Javois
Petitioner: George W Fisher
Respondent: Laurent Javois
Case Number: 4:2021cv00112
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of US COURT OF APPEALS: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, CDs, videos, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. (CLERK'S NOTE: All documents pertaining to this case are on CM/ECF. Nothing will be sent to the Court of Appeals.) (Davies, Cindy)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of US COURT OF APPEALS: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by April 8, 2021, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. (Davies, Cindy)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document #7 Notice of Appeal. (Davies, Cindy)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: ORDERED that the Court construes Petitioner's notice of appeal as containing a request for leave to proceed on appeal as a pauper and denies the request pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) (appeal may not be taken as a pauper if Court certifies that the appeal is not taken in good faith). The Clerk of the Court shall send this case to the Court of Appeals. Signed on March 12, 2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Davies, Cindy)
March 12, 2021 USCA Case Number from 8th Circuit is 21-1584 for #7 Notice of Appeal filed by George W Fisher. (Davies, Cindy)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order dated 3/1/2021 (Doc. #5 ) filed by George W Fisher. (Willis, Kathy)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Petitioner is granted provisional leave to proceed as a pauper, this case is dismissed without prejudice for Petitioner's failure to comply with 28 U.S.C. 2244(b)(3)(A), and the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. (Willis, Kathy)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that Petitioner is granted provisional leave to proceed as a pauper, this case is dismissed without prejudice for Petitioner's failure to comply with 28 U.S.C. 2244(b)(3)(A), and the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed on 3/1/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Willis, Kathy)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by George W Fisher. (Willis, Kathy)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by George W Fisher. (Willis, Kathy)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by George W Fisher (Attachments: #1 Petition Exhibits)(Willis, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Javois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George W Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Laurent Javois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?