Perez v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Perez
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00120
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 4/19/2021 as Document No. 24.1, Proposed Order. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. The Clerk's Office has been forwarded to Shauna Murphy-Carr. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Kern, Kendra)
April 19, 2021 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nathan J. Oleson on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc..(Oleson, Nathan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nathan J. Oleson on behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc..(Oleson, Nathan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 24 SUGGESTIONS in support re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nathan J. Oleson on behalf of Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Oleson, Nathan) Modified on 4/20/2021 to remove proposed order and emailed to Shauna Murphy-Carr. (Kern, Kendra)
April 19, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nathan J. Oleson on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/3/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Oleson, Nathan)
April 13, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION Regarding First Amended Complaint and Due Date for Defendants' Responsive Pleading by Gloria Perez. (Werts, Todd)
April 5, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Todd C. Werts on behalf of Gloria Perez.(Werts, Todd)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER entered by Judge Howard F. Sachs granting #19 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading. Defendants' Answer or responsive pleading is due April 13, 2021. Signed on 4/2/2021 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna)
March 29, 2021 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, #3 Return of Service of Complaint Executed, #4 Return of Service of Complaint Executed filed by Ramona Palmer-Eason on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 , #3 , #4 ) (Palmer-Eason, Ramona)
March 22, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of appearance by Jonathan P Slowik on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Jonathan P Slowik added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Slowik, Jonathan)
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of appearance by Laura Vaughn on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Laura Vaughn added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Vaughn, Laura)
March 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of appearance by Ida S Shafaie on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc. (Attorney Ida S Shafaie added to party Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ida S Shafaie added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Shafaie, Ida)
March 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance by Ramona Palmer-Eason on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc. (Palmer-Eason, Ramona)
March 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of appearance by Nathan J. Oleson on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Nathan J. Oleson added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Oleson, Nathan)
March 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Gregory William Knopp on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Gregory William Knopp added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Knopp, Gregory)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Nathan J. Oleson for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Jonathan P Slowik for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Laura Vaughn for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Gregory W Knopp for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to allow Nathan J. Oleson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7336458) filed by Ramona Palmer-Eason on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Palmer-Eason, Ramona)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to allow Jonathan P. Slowik to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7336454) filed by Ramona Palmer-Eason on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Palmer-Eason, Ramona)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to allow Laura Vaughn to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7336453) filed by Ramona Palmer-Eason on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Palmer-Eason, Ramona)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to allow Gregory W. Knopp to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7336449) filed by Ramona Palmer-Eason on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attorney Ramona Palmer-Eason added to party Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ramona Palmer-Eason added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Palmer-Eason, Ramona)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gloria Perez. Walmart Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Werts, Todd)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gloria Perez. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Werts, Todd)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Todd C. Werts on behalf of Gloria Perez. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7303153. Service due by 5/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Werts, Todd)
February 25, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. and Walmart Inc.; emailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Berner, Crystal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Vaughn
Represented By: Nathan J. Oleson
Represented By: Ramona Palmer-Eason
Represented By: Jonathan P Slowik
Represented By: Ida S Shafaie
Represented By: Gregory William Knopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Laura Vaughn
Represented By: Ramona Palmer-Eason
Represented By: Ida S Shafaie
Represented By: Gregory William Knopp
Represented By: Jonathan P Slowik
Represented By: Nathan J. Oleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Perez
Represented By: Todd C. Werts
Represented By: Bradford B. Lear
Represented By: Anthony Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?