Letterlough et al v. Hall et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Letterlough
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Darren Hall
3Rd Party Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2021cv00156
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of appearance by Elizabeth D Hatting on behalf of United States of America (Attorney Elizabeth D Hatting added to party United States of America(pty:3pd))(Hatting, Elizabeth)
April 29, 2021 Filing 18 RULES OF JURY TRIAL. Signed on 4/29/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/3/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2022 at 11:00 AM Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 4/29/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/29/2021. Scheduling Order to be entered. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Raymond Salva and Nick Schmiemeier. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Austin Green and Jeffrey Ray. Time in court: 11:00 a.m. to 11:20 a.m. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
April 21, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
April 17, 2021 Filing 15 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Shannon Letterlough. (Salva, Raymond)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that the Motion of the United States to Substitute and to Dismiss Counterclaim (Doc. #7) is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the United States is hereby substituted in place of Letterlough regarding Hall's counterclaim against Letterlough, and this counterclaim is DISMISSED as redundant and duplicative of Hall's pending third-party claim against the United States. Signed on 4/16/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #7 MOTION to substitute party and to dismiss counterclaim as redundant and duplicative filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Third Party Defendant United States of America, Counter Claimant United States of America. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Ray, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Rick Holtsclaw(Salva, Raymond)
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Counterclaim on behalf of Darren Hall.(Mullen, John)
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shannon Letterlough. (Salva, Raymond)
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to motion re #7 MOTION to substitute party and to dismiss counterclaim as redundant and duplicative filed by Nick Schmiemeier on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff Darren Hall. Reply suggestions due by 4/15/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schmiemeier, Nick)
March 25, 2021 Filing 8 United States' ANSWER to Complaint 's Counterclaim and Third-Party Petition, Third Party COUNTERCLAIM of the United States against Darren Hall for property damage against Darren Hall on behalf of United States of America, Shannon Letterlough.(Ray, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to substitute party and to dismiss counterclaim as redundant and duplicative filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Shannon Letterlough, United States of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/8/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ray, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 Before the Court is the Motion of the United States to Enlarge its Time to File an Answer to the Counterclaim and Third-Party Petition. (Doc. #5.) For good cause shown the motion is GRANTED. The United States shall file its answer or other response to the Counterclaim and Third-Party Petition for Damages filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant/Third-Party Plaintiff Darren Hall on or before March 25, 2021. Signed on 3/18/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file answer to Counterclaim and Third-Party Petition [Doc. 1, Ex. B] filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Shannon Letterlough, United States of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/1/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Jeffrey P. Ray added to party Shannon Letterlough(pty:cd))(Ray, Jeffrey)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP reassignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/16/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 11:00 a.m. before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Conference call-in numbers will be provided to counsel via email the week prior to the scheduling conference. Signed on 3/15/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 2116-CV11526, filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee $ 402 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [State court Petition], #2 Exhibit B [State court answer, counterclaim and third-party petition], #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ray, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Letterlough et al v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Darren Hall
Represented By: Nick Schmiemeier
Represented By: Shawn Gayland Foster
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Preuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Letterlough
Represented By: Raymond Salva, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Ray
Represented By: Shawn Gayland Foster
Represented By: Elizabeth D Hatting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?