McIntosh et al v. First Student, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marquita McIntosh
Defendant: Christy A Kelley and First Student, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00170
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of standing (Doc. #13) is, with Defendant having no objection, GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss on or before May 15, 2021. Signed on 5/5/2021 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Discovery due by 10/21/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2021. Please see Order for additional deadlines. Signed on 5/5/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy) Pretrial Teleconference set for 5/5/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Jury Trial set for 6/6/2022 09:00 AM (for 3 days) in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes.
May 5, 2021 Filing 15 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE held on 5/5/2021. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Basil North. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Bradley Zaffiri. Time in court: 10:35 a.m. to 10:43 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
May 5, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
April 29, 2021 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Bill Sanders(Zaffiri, Bradley)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time , MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, filed by Basil L North on behalf of Marquita McIntosh. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/11/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 11 ) (North, Basil)
April 27, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christy A Kelley. (Woods, Gloria)
April 20, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by First Student, Inc.. (Zaffiri, Bradley)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #10) is, with Defendant having no objection, GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted leave to respond to the motion to dismiss on or before April 30, 2021. In the future, motions of this type should be filed at least three days before the deadline established by rule or Court Order. Signed on 4/20/2021 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time filed by Basil L North on behalf of Marquita McIntosh. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/3/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (North, Basil)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by First Student, Inc.. (Zaffiri, Bradley)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in support re #7 MOTION to dismiss case for Lack of Standing filed by Bradley M Zaffiri on behalf of Defendant First Student, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Zaffiri, Bradley)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to dismiss case for Lack of Standing filed by Bradley M Zaffiri on behalf of First Student, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/15/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zaffiri, Bradley)
March 24, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/21/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 4/7/2021. Scheduling Teleconference set for 5/5/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 3/18/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Bradley M Zaffiri on behalf of First Student, Inc. (Attorney Bradley M Zaffiri added to party First Student, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zaffiri, Bradley)
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Thomas J. Magee on behalf of First Student, Inc. (Magee, Thomas)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Thomas J. Magee on behalf of Defendant First Student, Inc..(Magee, Thomas)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixteenth Judicial Circuit, Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 2116-CV00782, filed by Thomas J. Magee on behalf of First Student, Inc.. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7333463. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Petition Exhibit A)(Magee, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntosh et al v. First Student, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy A Kelley
Represented By: Bradley M Zaffiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Student, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Magee
Represented By: Bradley M Zaffiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquita McIntosh
Represented By: Basil L North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?