Davis v. Dedicated Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lexus Davis
Defendant: Wayde Jackson and Dedicated Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00226
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 6/14/2021. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/28/2021. Signed on 5/12/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Wayde Jackson.(Kraushaar, Corey)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Dedicated Logistics, LLC.(Kraushaar, Corey)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lexus Davis. (Wharton, Michael)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Corey L. Kraushaar on behalf of Defendant Dedicated Logistics, LLC.(Kraushaar, Corey)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff by Dedicated Logistics, LLC, Wayde Jackson (Kraushaar, Corey)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 2116-CV01946, filed by Corey L. Kraushaar. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7361799. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kraushaar, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Dedicated Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexus Davis
Represented By: Michael W Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayde Jackson
Represented By: Corey L. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dedicated Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Corey L. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?