Fahey v. Folgers Coffee Company ***Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-2984***
Plaintiff: A Kevin Fahey
Defendant: Folgers Coffee Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00244
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-03620.
April 13, 2021 Filing 13 EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1), dated 4/13/2021, from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Beth Phillips for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2984) (ztnr) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Nathan R. Gilbert is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/17/21. (DJS) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing of Complaint by A. KEVIN FAHEY re Set/Reset Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filed Complaint)(Willcox, Thomas) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by A. KEVIN FAHEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet of Toxin Free)(Willcox, Thomas) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Copy of the Complaint due by 2/2/2021. (tb) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By 2/2/21 the Plaintiff shall file a copy of the Complaint as a separate ECF entry. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/27/21. (DJS) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by FOLGERS COFFEE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by A. KEVIN FAHEY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Willcox, Thomas) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion for remand due by 1/8/2021. Response due by 1/22/2021 Reply due by 1/29/2021. (tb) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
December 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Joint Motion #7 for Scheduling Order: The deadline for Plaintiff to file its Motion to Remand is 1/8/21. Defendant's opposition is due 1/22/21. Plaintiff's Reply is due 1/29/21. The Defendant's obligation to respond to the Complaint and discovery are hereby stayed pending further order of the court. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/20/20. (DJS) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Briefing Schedule by FOLGERS COFFEE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FOLGERS COFFEE COMPANY (Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by FOLGERS COFFEE COMPANY filed by FOLGERS COFFEE COMPANY.(Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nathan R. Gilbert, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7948065. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by THE FOLGERS COFFEE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan R. Gilbert)(Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE FOLGERS COFFEE COMPANY (Rothstein, Ronald) Modified on 12/15/2020 (znmw). [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District of Columbia Superior Court, case number 2020 CA 004662 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-7947783 filed by THE FOLGERS COFFEE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
December 11, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests; emailed to rrothste@winston.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]
December 11, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to rrothste@winston.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) [Transferred from dcd on 4/14/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fahey v. Folgers Coffee Company ***Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-2984***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Folgers Coffee Company
Represented By: Ronald Y Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Kevin Fahey
Represented By: Thomas C. Willcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?