Thomson v. The J.M. Smucker Company et al ***Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-2984***
Plaintiff: Geoff Thomson
Defendant: The Folger Coffee Company and The J.M. Smucker Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00246
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00009.
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Missouri for inclusion in MDL No. 2984 in re: FOLGERS COFFEE MARKETING ANDSALES PRACTICES LITIGATION and assigned to the Honorable Beth Phillips. (signed by Clerk of the Panel) (kcv, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Geoff Thomson (Walsh, Bonner) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
March 18, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference RESET for 6/16/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale via telephone conf. (jmv, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying the #5 Motion to Stay; and granting the #7 Joint Motion to Postpone Dates in Courts Order Setting Civil Action for Rule 16 Management Conference. It is ordered that the Rule 16 Management Conference in this matter is reset to June 17, 2021. All hearings and court dates are hereby vacated until further notice from the Court. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/17/2021. (kcv, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
March 17, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference reset for 6/17/2021 at 11:00 via telephone (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (kcv, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION re #6 Order,, Set Hearings, to Postpone Dates in Court's Order Setting Civil Action for Rule 16 Management Conference by The Folger Coffee Company, The J.M. Smucker Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, Rex) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing parties to conduct Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference by 3/11/2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2021 at 11:00 AM, via telephone, before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 2/18/21. (kcv, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the JPML by The Folger Coffee Company, The J.M. Smucker Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, Rex) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
January 18, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Geoff Thomson. The J.M. Smucker Company waiver sent on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Walsh, Bonner) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
January 18, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Geoff Thomson. The Folger Coffee Company waiver sent on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Walsh, Bonner) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to The Folger Coffee Company, The J.M. Smucker Company and emailed to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) The J.M. Smucker Company)(kcv, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (kcv, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
January 8, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by plaintiff Geoff Thomson. (kcv, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
January 8, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kcv, ) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Folger Coffee Company, The J.M. Smucker Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8189032.), filed by Geoff Thomson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es) to The Folger Coffee Company, #3 Summons(es) to The J.M. Smucker Company)(Walsh, Bonner) [Transferred from txed on 4/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomson v. The J.M. Smucker Company et al ***Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-2984***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Folger Coffee Company
Represented By: Rex Andrew Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The J.M. Smucker Company
Represented By: Rex Andrew Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoff Thomson
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?