Troyer v. Ally Bank Corp et al
Plaintiff: Phillip J Troyer
Defendant: Ally Bank Corp and Alltran Financial, LP
Case Number: 4:2021cv00308
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Alice Hodsden on behalf of Defendant Ally Bank Corp.(Hodsden, Alice)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Skyler D Davenport on behalf of Ally Bank Corp (Attorney Skyler D Davenport added to party Ally Bank Corp(pty:dft))(Davenport, Skyler)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 7/6/2021. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/20/2021. Signed on 6/4/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) Modified on 6/4/2021 - A copy has been mailed to Plaintiff. (Strodtman, Tracy)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Ally Bank Corp.(Attorney Alice Hodsden added to party Ally Bank Corp(pty:dft))(Hodsden, Alice)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Paul Croker on behalf of Defendant Alltran Financial, LP.(Croker, Paul)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint on behalf of Alltran Financial, LP.(Attorney Paul Croker added to party Alltran Financial, LP(pty:dft))(Croker, Paul)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director.Notice of MAP Assignment and General Order hand delivered to Pro Se Plaintiff in office on today's date. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Phillip J Troyer. $402 paid, receipt # KCMO089850. Service due by 8/3/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria)
May 5, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alltran Financial, LP, Ally Bank Corp. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troyer v. Ally Bank Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip J Troyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank Corp
Represented By: Alice Hodsden
Represented By: Skyler D Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alltran Financial, LP
Represented By: Paul Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?