Foley Industries, Inc. v. Nelson
Plaintiff: Foley Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Kammy Nelson
Case Number: 4:2021cv00309
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 unopposed motion for extension of time to file response re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction over state law claims Suggestions in opposition/response due on or before 7/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 6/25/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction over state law claims (Unopposed) filed by Brian Baggott on behalf of Foley Industries, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Baggott, Brian)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Lara Pabst on behalf of Kammy Nelson (Attorney Lara Pabst added to party Kammy Nelson(pty:dft))(Pabst, Lara)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Ivan Nugent on behalf of Kammy Nelson (Attorney Ivan Nugent added to party Kammy Nelson(pty:dft))(Nugent, Ivan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUGGESTIONS in support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction over state law claims filed by Stephen J. Moore on behalf of Defendant Kammy Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Lara Krigel Pabst)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Moore, Stephen)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction over state law claims filed by Stephen J. Moore on behalf of Kammy Nelson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Stephen J. Moore added to party Kammy Nelson(pty:dft))(Moore, Stephen)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brian Baggott on behalf of Plaintiff Foley Industries, Inc..(Baggott, Brian)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kammy Nelson filed by Brian Baggott on behalf of Foley Industries, Inc.. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7406155. Service due by 8/4/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Baggott, Brian)
May 6, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kammy Nelson. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foley Industries, Inc. v. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foley Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Baggott
Represented By: Nicole Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kammy Nelson
Represented By: Stephen J. Moore
Represented By: Ivan Nugent
Represented By: Lara Pabst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?