Williams v. Blair
Petitioner: Samuel H. Williams
Respondent: Paul Blair
Case Number: 4:2021cv00314
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-01691.
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM regarding filing fee by Petitioner Samuel H. Williams. (ANP) [Transferred from moed on 5/7/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Mon Dec 7 15:45:27 CST 2020 (Marshall, Sean) [Transferred from moed on 5/7/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER to: Western Distict of Missouri. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. See 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). ( Case to be transferred after 12/21/2020.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/7/2020. (SMM) [Transferred from moed on 5/7/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ) [Transferred from moed on 5/7/2021.]
December 3, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Dec 3 11:02:12 CST 2020 (admin,) [Transferred from moed on 5/7/2021.]
December 3, 2020 ***A Pro Se Case note. Is the complaint signed? - Yes. Is the complaint filed on the required form? - Yes. Is the filing fee paid? - No. Is there a motion for IFP? - No. Is there an inmate account statement or financial Affidavit? - No. Are there any Judge conflicts? - No. Are there any previously filed cases? - Yes. Case List: 4:13-CV-02225-RWS; 4:15-CV-00963-ACL; 4:17-CV-01791-PLC; 4:19-CV-03137-PLC;. Is there correct venue alleged? - Yes. Has the plaintiff alleged capacity of the defendants? - Unknown. Is plaintiff requesting a TRO? - No. Is this a death penalty case? - No. Is the petitioner requesting relief re: Johnson? - No. (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 5/7/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 5/7/2021.]
December 3, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 5/7/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2254 FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY A PERSON IN STATE CUSTODY by Petitioner Samuel H. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJO) [Transferred from moed on 5/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Blair
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?