Miller v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Linda R Miller
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2021cv00316
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 17 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - MDL 1153 Fact Sheets, #3 Exhibit C - CMO 12 Records Collection, #4 Exhibit D - Bard IVC Filter MDL Protective Order)(Stubbs, Kara)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Parties Joint Motion for Temporary Stay, Doc. #13 , is granted in part and denied in part. The matter is stayed until July 5, 2021. If parties have not notified the Court of actual settlement by that date, then the parties must file by that date a joint proposed scheduling order that complies with Local Rule 16.1 and that states whether the case will be tried to the Court or to a jury and the anticipated length of the trial. Signed on 6/2/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levin, Benjamin)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. In light of the fact that other counsel continue to represent Defendants, Richard B. North, Jr. is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants, (Doc. #10 ). Signed on 06/02/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Lock, Tania)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. This case is related to another case assigned to the Honorable Nanette K. Laughrey. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.9 and with Judge Laughreys consent, this case is transferred to Judge Laughrey for all further proceedings. District Judge Brian C. Wimes no longer assigned to case. Signed on 6/1/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/4/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Enjolique A Lett for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
May 12, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to allow Enjolique A. Lett to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7414278) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stubbs, Kara)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Stubbs, Kara)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-00370. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2021: #2 Certified Docket Sheet) (Houston, Kiambu).
May 6, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 *AMENDED by Doc. #7 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - (1) The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 20972 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/4/19. (MAP) *Modified on 4/15/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]
February 6, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-0370-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]
February 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13885506 filed by Linda R Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 5/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda R Miller
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: David C. DeGreeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Enjolique A Lett
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Enjolique A Lett
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?