Dudley v. Truman Medical Center
Plaintiff: Terry Marie Dudley
Defendant: Truman Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2021cv00317
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 ***Remark A copy of order issued 5/21/2021, deficiency letter and original documents returned via regular mail to: Terry Marie Dudley 8901 Carter Street, Apt. 101 Overland Park, KS 66212. (Kern, Kendra)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 motion and returning filing fee. A copy of the order has been mailed to Plaintiff. Signed on 5/21/2021 by District Judge Greg Kays. (law clerk)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Reinstate Case on Docket re #3 Order of Dismissal filed by Terry Marie Dudley. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/2/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Woods, Gloria)
May 19, 2021 RECEIPT number KCMO090105 in the amount of $402.00 issued to Terry Marie Dudley. (Woods, Gloria)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order denying leave to file without payment and dismissing case. A copy of the order has been mailed to Plaintiff. Signed on 5/18/2021 by District Judge Greg Kays. (law clerk)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Terry Marie Dudley. (Crocker, Susan)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terry Marie Dudley. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/24/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Fax Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope)(Crocker, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley v. Truman Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truman Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Marie Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?