Bibbs v. Jackson
Plaintiff: Thomas E Bibbs
Defendant: Marilyn Jackson and Fedrick Marshal d/b/a Building Management Company, Community Building Group and Sunlight Investors
Case Number: 4:2021cv00327
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Richard, Tracey) (Clerk's Note: A copy of this document was mailed via 1st class mail to: Thomas E Bibbs, 3220 Norton, Kansas City, MO 64128)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed on 6/3/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)(Clerk's Note: A copy of this order was mailed via 1st class mail to: Thomas E Bibbs, 3220 Norton, Kansas City, MO 64128)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marilyn Jackson, Fedrick Marshal Thomas E Bibbs. Service due by 8/31/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Houston, Kiambu) Modified on 6/3/2021 to add service date (Houston, Kiambu).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 5/14/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) Modified on 5/14/2021 to reflect a copy has been mailed to Thomas E Bibbs 3220 Norton Kansas City, MO 64128 (Ellis, Lindsey).
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Thomas E Bibbs. (Crocker, Susan)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thomas E Bibbs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crocker, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bibbs v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Bibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedrick Marshal d/b/a Building Management Company, Community Building Group and Sunlight Investors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?