Dimoff et al v. Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Janet Dimoff and John Dimoff
Defendant: TGE Group, LLC, HHC Investments, LLC, U.S. Industries Group, Inc., Craig Taylor, Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC and Daniel Mazilu
Case Number: 4:2021cv00344
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by James F. Freeman, III on behalf of Defendants HHC Investments, LLC, U.S. Industries Group, Inc..(Freeman, James)
July 15, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of appearance by Karen A. Read on behalf of HHC Investments, LLC, U.S. Industries Group, Inc. (Attorney Karen A. Read added to party HHC Investments, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Karen A. Read added to party U.S. Industries Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Read, Karen)
July 15, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of appearance by Joseph J. Roper on behalf of HHC Investments, LLC, U.S. Industries Group, Inc. (Attorney Joseph J. Roper added to party HHC Investments, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph J. Roper added to party U.S. Industries Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Roper, Joseph)
July 12, 2021 Filing 46 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #23 MOTION to remand filed by Stephen M. Murphy on behalf of Defendant Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 7/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Murphy, Stephen)
July 12, 2021 Filing 45 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James F. Freeman, III on behalf of Defendant HHC Investments, LLC. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Freeman, James)
July 12, 2021 Filing 44 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James F. Freeman, III on behalf of Defendant U.S. Industries Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Freeman, James)
July 7, 2021 Filing 43 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Philip Albrecht on behalf of Defendant Daniel Mazilu. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Attorney Philip Albrecht added to party Daniel Mazilu(pty:dft))(Albrecht, Philip)
July 6, 2021 Filing 42 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephen M. Murphy on behalf of Defendant Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Murphy, Stephen)
July 2, 2021 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs of Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories and Plaintiffs' First Requests for Production of Documents to each Defendant filed by Alex Michael Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs Janet Dimoff, John Dimoff.(Johnson, Alex)
July 1, 2021 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Robert M Pitkin on behalf of Defendants TGE Group, LLC, Craig Taylor.(Pitkin, Robert)
July 1, 2021 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs of Plaintiffs' First Amended Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures filed by Alex Michael Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs Janet Dimoff, John Dimoff.(Johnson, Alex)
July 1, 2021 Filing 38 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Janet Dimoff, John Dimoff. (Johnson, Alex)
July 1, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 6/30/2021 as Document No. 35, Consent PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. The document has been deleted per Administrative Procedures wherein it is stated proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
June 30, 2021 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Alex Michael Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs Janet Dimoff, John Dimoff.(Johnson, Alex)
June 30, 2021 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Stephen M. Murphy on behalf of Defendant Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC.(Murphy, Stephen)
June 30, 2021 Filing 35 Consent PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Janet Dimoff, John Dimoff. (Johnson, Alex)
June 30, 2021 Filing 34 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Bruce Waugh(Johnson, Alex)
June 30, 2021 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kenton E. Snow on behalf of Defendant Daniel Mazilu.(Snow, Kenton)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #28 motion for extension of time. Signed on June 30, 2021, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
June 28, 2021 Filing 31 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alex Michael Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs Janet Dimoff, John Dimoff. Reply suggestions due by 7/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Johnson, Alex)
June 28, 2021 Filing 30 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alex Michael Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs Janet Dimoff, John Dimoff. Reply suggestions due by 7/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Johnson, Alex)
June 28, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #9 MOTION to dismiss party TGE Group, LLC and Craig E. Taylor filed by Robert M Pitkin on behalf of Defendants TGE Group, LLC, Craig Taylor. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Pitkin, Robert)
June 24, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for extension of time Unopposed filed by Stephen M. Murphy on behalf of Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/8/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Modified on 6/24/2021 per request of attorney to remove additional parties and regenerated NEF (Berner, Crystal).
June 23, 2021 Filing 27 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alex Michael Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs Janet Dimoff, John Dimoff. Reply suggestions due by 7/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Johnson, Alex)
June 22, 2021 Filing 26 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alex Michael Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs Janet Dimoff, John Dimoff. Reply suggestions due by 7/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Johnson, Alex)
June 21, 2021 Filing 25 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION to dismiss party TGE Group, LLC and Craig E. Taylor filed by Alex Michael Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs Janet Dimoff, John Dimoff. Reply suggestions due by 7/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Johnson, Alex)
June 14, 2021 Filing 24 SUGGESTIONS in support re #23 MOTION to remand filed by Alex Michael Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs Janet Dimoff, John Dimoff. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Johnson, Alex)
June 14, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to remand filed by Alex Michael Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/28/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Johnson, Alex)
June 14, 2021 Filing 22 SUGGESTIONS in support re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James F. Freeman, III on behalf of Defendant U.S. Industries Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order granting extension)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Freeman, James)
June 14, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James F. Freeman, III on behalf of U.S. Industries Group, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/28/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Freeman, James)
June 14, 2021 Filing 20 SUGGESTIONS in support re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James F. Freeman, III on behalf of Defendant HHC Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract for Sale and Purchase, #2 Exhibit B - Order granting extension)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Freeman, James)
June 14, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James F. Freeman, III on behalf of HHC Investments, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/28/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Freeman, James)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 motion for extension of time to file response/reply. Signed on June 4, 2021, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
June 4, 2021 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #9 MOTION to dismiss party TGE Group, LLC and Craig E. Taylor filed by Alex Michael Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/18/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #10 , #12 , #9 ) (Johnson, Alex)
June 2, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James F. Freeman, III on behalf of Defendants HHC Investments, LLC, U.S. Industries Group, Inc..(Freeman, James)
June 2, 2021 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Stephen M. Murphy on behalf of Defendant Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC.(Murphy, Stephen)
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Robert M Pitkin on behalf of Defendants TGE Group, LLC, Craig Taylor.(Pitkin, Robert)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kenton E. Snow on behalf of Defendant Daniel Mazilu. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Snow, Kenton)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kenton E. Snow on behalf of Daniel Mazilu. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Snow, Kenton)
May 26, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephen M. Murphy on behalf of Defendant Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Murphy, Stephen)
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephen M. Murphy on behalf of Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Murphy, Stephen)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to dismiss party TGE Group, LLC and Craig E. Taylor filed by Robert M Pitkin on behalf of TGE Group, LLC, Craig Taylor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Pitkin, Robert)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing of Consent to Removal by Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC by Daniel Mazilu (Snow, Kenton)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 6/22/2021. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/6/2021. Signed on 5/20/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Jared Cluck on behalf of Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC (Cluck, Jared)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by James F. Freeman, III on behalf of HHC Investments, LLC, U.S. Industries Group, Inc. (Freeman, James)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Consent to Notice of Removal by HHC Investments, LLC, U.S. Industries Group, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Freeman, James)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Consent to Removal by TGE Group, LLC, Craig Taylor re #1 Notice of Removal, (Pitkin, Robert)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 2116-CV08143, Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7419215. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice to Adverse Party, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice to State Court of Removal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Original Filing Form, #5 Exhibit 5 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dimoff et al v. Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Dimoff
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Alex Michael Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Iain Spitsnogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dimoff
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Alex Michael Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Iain Spitsnogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TGE Group, LLC
Represented By: Robert M Pitkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHC Investments, LLC
Represented By: James F. Freeman, III
Represented By: Joseph J. Roper
Represented By: Karen A. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Industries Group, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Freeman, III
Represented By: Joseph J. Roper
Represented By: Karen A. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Taylor
Represented By: Robert M Pitkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidson Architecture & Engineering, LLC
Represented By: Stephen M. Murphy
Represented By: Jared Cluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Mazilu
Represented By: Kenton E. Snow
Represented By: Philip Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?