Kagel v. Schmitt
Petitioner: Rodney J Kagel
Respondent: Eric Schmitt
Case Number: 4:2021cv00448
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Case electronically transferred to District of Eastern District of Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
July 2, 2021 RECEIPT number KCMO090723 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Rodney J Kagel. (Woods, Gloria)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: ORDERED that this petition for a writ of habeas corpus is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 6/29/2021 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Willis, Kathy)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Rodney J Kagel. (Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kagel v. Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodney J Kagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?