Curne v. The United States et al
Plaintiff: Jarrell D Curne
Defendant: The United States, The United States of America, The United States Attorney General and FBI CJIS Division Criminal History Analysis Team 1 BTC 3
Case Number: 4:2021cv00601
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0923
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE MOTION for order - Motion to Withdraw Summons filed by Jarrell D Curne. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/23/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ellis, Lindsey)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying as moot #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 8/24/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
August 20, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to The United States. (Woods, Gloria)
August 20, 2021 RECEIPT number KCMO091406 in the amount of $402.00 issued to Jarrell Curne. Plaintiff paid $402.00 civil filing fee on today's date. (Woods, Gloria)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jarrell D Curne. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/2/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A and B, #4 Exhibit C and D, #5 Exhibit E and F, #6 Exhibit G and H)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curne v. The United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrell D Curne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI CJIS Division Criminal History Analysis Team 1 BTC 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?