Aquino v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Plaintiff: Salvador Aquino
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 4:2021cv00672
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/3/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 12/13/2021. Signed on 11/10/21 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(Blickhan, James)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by James Kevin Blickhan on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Attorney James Kevin Blickhan added to party Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois(pty:dft))(Blickhan, James)
September 28, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Woods, Gloria)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7589597. Service due by 12/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hinrichs, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aquino v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Aquino
Represented By: Nicholas Hinrichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: James Kevin Blickhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?