Kinsale Insurance Company v. OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kinsale Insurance Company
Defendant: OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC, Julie D. Lambert and Jimmie Lee Pena
Case Number: 4:2021cv00695
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of appearance by Christopher Smith on behalf of Kinsale Insurance Company (Attorney Christopher Smith added to party Kinsale Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Smith, Christopher)
November 16, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael Barzee on behalf of Defendants Julie D. Lambert, OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC.(Barzee, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Filing 15 OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC and Julie D. Lambert's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and, COUNTERCLAIM against Kinsale Insurance Company on behalf of Julie D. Lambert, OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC.(Myers, James)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting, with Plaintiff's consent, #13 motion for leave to file Answer out of time. Defendants OA Centers of Kansas City and Julie Lambert shall have three business days to electronically file their Answer. Signed on 11/12/2021 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
November 11, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to file Answer out of Time filed by James David Myers on behalf of Julie D. Lambert, OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Myers, James)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/27/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 12/13/2021. Signed on 11/10/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Michael Barzee on behalf of Julie D. Lambert, OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC (Attorney Michael Barzee added to party Julie D. Lambert(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Barzee added to party OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC(pty:dft))(Barzee, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by James David Myers on behalf of Julie D. Lambert, OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC (Attorney James David Myers added to party Julie D. Lambert(pty:dft), Attorney James David Myers added to party OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC(pty:dft))(Myers, James)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kinsale Insurance Company. OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Probasco, Angela)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kinsale Insurance Company. Julie D. Lambert served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Probasco, Angela)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kinsale Insurance Company. Jimmie Lee Pena served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Probasco, Angela)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint on behalf of Jimmie Lee Pena. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Attorney John Rollins added to party Jimmie Lee Pena(pty:dft))(Rollins, John)
October 7, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Melvin, Greg)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants filed by Angela Probasco on behalf of Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Probasco, Angela)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff shall have ten days to file an Amended Complaint that sets forth the proper basis for jurisdiction. See Order for details. Signed on 9/28/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Angela Probasco on behalf of Plaintiff Kinsale Insurance Company.(Probasco, Angela)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants filed by Angela Probasco on behalf of Kinsale Insurance Company. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7601432. Service due by 12/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Probasco, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinsale Insurance Company v. OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinsale Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela Probasco
Represented By: Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OA Centers of Kansas City, LLC
Represented By: James David Myers
Represented By: Michael Barzee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie D. Lambert
Represented By: James David Myers
Represented By: Michael Barzee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie Lee Pena
Represented By: John Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?