Milburn v. Encompass et al
Defendant: Encompass Indemnity Company and Michael T Nance
Plaintiff / Appellant: Judy Milburn
Case Number: 4:2021cv00696
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Discovery due by 3/21/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2022.Please see Order for additional deadlines. Signed on 11/23/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy) Pretrial Teleconference set for 11/4/2022 09:30 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Jury Trial set for 11/28/2022 09:00 AM (for 3 days) in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes.
November 23, 2021 Filing 18 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE held on 11/23/2021. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): James Thompson. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Thomas Golson, Mimi Doherty. Time in court: 10:37 a.m. to 10:47 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
November 11, 2021 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION to remand and Integrated Suggestions in Support Thereof filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Defendant Michael T Nance. Reply suggestions due by 11/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Doherty, Mimi)
November 11, 2021 Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION to remand and Integrated Suggestions in Support Thereof Defendant Encompass Indemnity Company's Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Thomas J. Golson on behalf of Defendant Encompass Indemnity Company. Reply suggestions due by 11/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Golson, Thomas)
November 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings Regarding Count III - Declaratory Action & SIS filed by Thomas J. Golson on behalf of Encompass Indemnity Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Golson, Thomas)
November 10, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming HON. VICTOR HOWARD(Golson, Thomas)
November 3, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Defendant Michael T Nance.(Doherty, Mimi)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Thomas J. Golson on behalf of Defendant Encompass Indemnity Company.(Golson, Thomas)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Thomas J. Golson on behalf of Defendant Encompass Indemnity Company.(Golson, Thomas)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Encompass Indemnity Company. (Golson, Thomas)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to remand and Integrated Suggestions in Support Thereof filed by James H. Thompson, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Summons, #2 Exhibit Return of Summons)(Thompson, James)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Encompass Indemnity Company.(Golson, Thomas)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Mimi Elizabeth Doherty on behalf of Michael T Nance (Attorney Mimi Elizabeth Doherty added to party Michael T Nance(pty:dft))(Doherty, Mimi)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/3/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 10/20/2021. Scheduling Teleconference set for 11/23/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 9/29/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Thomas J. Golson on behalf of Encompass Indemnity Company (Golson, Thomas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Lead Counsel by Encompass Indemnity Company. (McCausland, Michael)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Michael E. McCausland on behalf of Encompass Indemnity Company (Attorney Michael E. McCausland added to party Encompass Indemnity Company(pty:dft))(McCausland, Michael)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clay County, case number 21CY-CV07082, Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7603716. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Release of Nance, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Encompass Policy, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Nance's Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - SIS Nance's Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Petition & Pleadings, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Removal Notice Filing)(Golson, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milburn v. Encompass et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael E. McCausland
Represented By: Thomas J. Golson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T Nance
Represented By: Mimi Elizabeth Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Judy Milburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?