Schooler v. Amazon Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Schooler
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc., Ares Transportation LLC and Nosaze Ighodaro
Case Number: 4:2021cv00699
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 11/22/2021 as Document No. 11, Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER & Trial Order. The document has been deleted per Administrative Procedures wherein it is stated proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu)
November 24, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Rick Holtsclaw(Slater, Erica)
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER & Trial Order by Matthew Schooler. (Slater, Erica)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Ares Transportation LLC.(Hatley, Heather)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Heather Hatley on behalf of Ares Transportation LLC (Attorney Heather Hatley added to party Ares Transportation LLC(pty:dft))(Hatley, Heather)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc..(Tranen, Daniel)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Defendant Amazon's motion for extension of time to file a responsive pleading. Signed on October 14, 2021, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
October 13, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 11/8/2021. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/22/2021. Signed on 10/7/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Julia Wilke on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc. (Attorney Julia Wilke added to party Amazon Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wilke, Julia)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by Daniel E. Tranen on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/20/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Tranen, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to Counsel for Plaintiff by Amazon Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Exhibit Attachment Notice of Removal to State Court)(Tranen, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cass County, case number 21CA-CC00166, filed by Daniel E. Tranen. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7604428. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition (Matthew Schooler), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tranen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schooler v. Amazon Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Schooler
Represented By: Erica Blume Slater
Represented By: John G. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Represented By: Julia Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ares Transportation LLC
Represented By: Heather Hatley
Represented By: John L. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nosaze Ighodaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?