Smith v. The State of Missouri
Plaintiff: Gregory Wayne Smith
Defendant: The State of Missouri
Case Number: 4:2021cv00714
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1320
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Crocker, Susan)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Crocker, Susan)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Wheeler, LaTandra)*Judgment sent via regular mail to Plaintiff.
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and finding as moot #3 motion to reassign/transfer case. This case is dismissed. Signed on 10/5/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Brown, Jonathan) Modified on 10/5/2021 to reflect a copy of the Order mailed to Gregory Wayne Smith 12310 3rd Street Apt. 2 Grandview, MO 64030 (Woods, Gloria).
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION to reassign/transfer case on behalf of Plaintiff Gregory Wayne Smith. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Ellis, Lindsey)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Gregory Wayne Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ellis, Lindsey)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Ellis, Lindsey)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory Wayne Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellis, Lindsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. The State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Wayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?