Matfield v. McDonald's et al
Plaintiff: Drake Allen Matfield
Defendant: McDonald's, Karen Resigner Owner doing business as McDonald's, Cres Velarde and Kris Simpson
Case Number: 4:2021cv00786
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to McDonald's, Karen Resigner, Kris Simpson, Cres Velarde.Mr. Matfield brought in summonses for the four defendants on 12/03/2021. The summonses, along with the USM-285 forms, copies of the complaint and a certified copy of the Order, hand delivered to the US Marshal Office on 12/06/2021. (Woods, Gloria)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Drake Allen Matfield. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Woods, Gloria)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 11/8/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Brown, Jonathan) Modified on 11/8/2021 to reflect a copy of the Order along with Process Forms (summons, USM-285) were mailed to plaintiff. Instructions were included directing the plaintiff to fill in the required information on the process forms and return to the Clerk's Office. (Woods, Gloria).
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Drake Allen Matfield. (Woods, Gloria)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Drake Allen Matfield. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/15/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matfield v. McDonald's et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drake Allen Matfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Resigner Owner doing business as McDonald's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cres Velarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?