Cho v. Saint Luke's Physician Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dr. Kenneth Cho
Defendant: Saint Luke's Physician Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00794
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Referring Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Brad K. Thoenen on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth Cho. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Thoenen, Brad)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Alyssa Gonnerman on behalf of Defendant Saint Luke's Physician Group, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 12/30/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Gonnerman, Alyssa)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to remand filed by Brad K. Thoenen on behalf of Kenneth Cho. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thoenen, Brad)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE entered by the Honorable Howard F. Sachs. With the consent of the Honorable Fernando J. Gaitan, Case 21-794-HFS is hereby transferred to Judge Gaitan with the lower Case 21-765. Case reassigned to District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. for all further proceedings. District Judge Howard F. Sachs no longer assigned to case. Please note the new case number is 4:21-00794-CV-W-FJG. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
November 10, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/20/2021. Signed on 11/4/2021 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Nolte, Melissa)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2116-CV23840, Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7657039. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gonnerman, Alyssa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cho v. Saint Luke's Physician Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Kenneth Cho
Represented By: Brad K. Thoenen
Represented By: John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Represented By: Kevin Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Luke's Physician Group, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa Gonnerman
Represented By: Jeffrey D Hanslick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?