Williams v. Missouri Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Maceo Williams
Defendant: Missouri Attorney General, Eric Schmitt and Brad Caudle
Case Number: 4:2021cv00802
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion to dismiss case.. Signed on 11/24/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Houston, Kiambu) Order mailed on 11/24/2021 to Maceo Williams, 6861 North Olive St. Apt. 7, Gladstone, MO 64118
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Maceo Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/8/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu)(Submitted on 11/24/2021 via EDSS)
November 22, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. Mr. Williams presented completed forms in office on today's date. Summons, USM-285, and Copies of the Complaint for all Defendants delivered to the U.S. Marshals as directed per Order #3 . (Woods, Gloria)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Brad Caudle, Missouri Attorney General, Eric Schmitt by Maceo Williams. Service due by 2/15/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Houston, Kiambu)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed on 11/17/2021 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Maceo Williams. (Woods, Gloria)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Maceo Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/24/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint - Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Mandamus, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Missouri Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maceo Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Caudle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?