Clary v. Lowe's Home Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Kay Clary
Defendant: Lowe's Home Center, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00818
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Kay Clary. (Graham, Gene)
January 5, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Judge Robert Schieber(Graham, Gene)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Lowe's Home Center, LLC.(Pezza, Brian)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Devin Hayes on behalf of Lowe's Home Center, LLC (Hayes, Devin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Notice to Clerk of Removal by Lowe's Home Center, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court Clerk, #2 Exhibit Confirmation of Filing)(Pezza, Brian)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/3/2022. Signed on 11/17/2021 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Nolte, Melissa)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Thomas P. Berra, Jr on behalf of Lowe's Home Center, LLC (Berra, Thomas)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. (Pezza, Brian)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Removal by Lowe's Home Center, LLC (Pezza, Brian)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2116-cv22075, filed by Brian P. Pezza. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7676617. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Exhibit Ridley Declaration, #3 Exhibit Pezza Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pezza, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clary v. Lowe's Home Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay Clary
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr.
Represented By: Deborah J Blakely
Represented By: Taylor Michelle Arri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Center, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Pezza
Represented By: Devin Hayes
Represented By: Thomas P. Berra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?